This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 16:29:11 (UTC).

KURNIAWAN IWAN vs. PEOPLE'S TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/29/2018 KURNIAWAN IWAN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against PEOPLE'S TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD P HILL II. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GERALD P HILL II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KURNIAWAN, IWAN

Defendant

PEOPLE'S TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Cheif Financial Officer As Ra, 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

05/29/2018: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • DispositionParty: PEOPLE'S TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY; Disposition Code: DBHO; Description: DISM BEF HRG OTHER; Date: 10/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT PEOPLE'S TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketALTERNATIVE FOR MORE DEFINITIVE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT PEOPLE'S TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAITNIFF'S COMPLAINT OR IN THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED -PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY BY SERVING BRETT FRANKEL ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • FinancialDate: 05/31/2018; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: DEAN MAKRIS; Receipt Number: 7607225

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- PEOPLE'S TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less