This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/06/2020 at 17:12:32 (UTC).

KITTRELL EDDIE vs. BARBER CHRIS

Case Summary

On 04/23/2018 KITTRELL EDDIE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BARBER CHRIS. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WAYNE DURDEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WAYNE DURDEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KITTRELL, EDDIE

Defendants

IVES, DALE

Winter Haven, FL 33880-1656

BARBER, CHRIS

Auburndale, FL 33823

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAMAYO JOHN MARC

1701 S Florida Avenue, P O Box 2369

Lakeland, FL 33803

Defendant Attorney

BLANKENSHIP RANDALL GARY

170 E Central Avenue

Winter Haven, FL 33880

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFENDANTS SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT AND

01/20/2020: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFENDANTS SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT AND

DCA ORDER

01/02/2020: DCA ORDER

DCA ORDER

01/02/2020: DCA ORDER

AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL

12/20/2019: AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL

DEFENDANT DALE IVES WITNESS LIST EXHIBIT LIST AND DEMONSTRATIVE AIDS LIST

10/08/2019: DEFENDANT DALE IVES WITNESS LIST EXHIBIT LIST AND DEMONSTRATIVE AIDS LIST

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

02/22/2019: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

MEDIATORS REPORT- IMPASSE

02/01/2019: MEDIATORS REPORT- IMPASSE

CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY REGARDING MEDIATION

01/10/2019: CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY REGARDING MEDIATION

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

01/10/2019: NOTICE OF MEDIATION

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/19/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

09/14/2018: ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITIVE STATEMENT

08/28/2018: ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITIVE STATEMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/15/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

ANSWER

05/17/2018: ANSWER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATINO OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

05/16/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATINO OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

DEFENDANT, DALE IVES MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITIVE STATEMENT

05/16/2018: DEFENDANT, DALE IVES MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITIVE STATEMENT

COMPLAINT

04/23/2018: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/23/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • HearingCourt Date: 03/04/2020; Court Time: 2:30 PM; Location: BARTOW HRG RM 9B2 RED ELEVATOR; Motion: OTSC - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Section: 11; Judge: WAYNE DURDEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDCA ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketReason: OTSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 03/04/2020 02:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR SANCITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFENDANTS SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANTS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDCA ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATINO OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, DALE IVES MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITIVE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-DALE IVES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-CHRIS BARBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • FinancialDate: 04/26/2018; Amount: 420.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: JOHN MARC TAMAYO; Receipt Number: 7567750

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- DALE IVES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- CHRIS BARBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less