This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 02/21/2022 at 22:08:37 (UTC).

KIRKLAND MARK S vs. SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 KIRKLAND MARK S filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WAYNE DURDEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WAYNE DURDEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KIRKLAND MARK S

KIRKLAND CATALINA MENDOZA

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA DAVID

250 N Orange Avenue Suite 605

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorney

JOHNSON DAVID

1001 Broadway Ave

Ormond Beach, FL 32174

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - GENERAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketMELISSA BURT DEVRIESE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY DBA SECURITY FIRST FLORIDA BY SERVING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • FinancialDate: 12/28/2021; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: EPORTAL - CIVIL LAW; Receipt Number: 8973691

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY WITH PROPOSED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA DAVID