This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/02/2020 at 01:36:47 (UTC).

KEENE FLETCHER C vs. KEENE RHONDA

Case Summary

On 10/19/2017 KEENE FLETCHER C filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KEENE RHONDA. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEENE, FLETCHER C

Defendant

KEENE, RHONDA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION FOR CONTEMPT AND FOR OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION FOR CONTEMPT AND FOR OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 06/19/2018 04:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketReason: MTN_COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 06/19/2018 04:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketReason: MTN_COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 06/19/2018 04:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED RHONDA KEENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketHUSBANDS PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketHUSBANDS DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less