This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 10/07/2020 at 20:32:51 (UTC).

KALLMAN, AMANDA

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 KALLMAN, AMANDA was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN K STARGEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN K STARGEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KALLMAN, HAROLD

KALLMAN, PATRICIA PARSONS

Interested Party

FUMICH, ADA DIANE

Not Yet Classified

KALLMAN, AMANDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER KEITH DAVID

245 South Central Ave

Bartow, FL 33830

Not Yet Classified Attorney

ALBAUM KEVIN R

500 S Florida Avenue, Suite 800

Lakeland, FL 33801

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 10/23/2020 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketCONSENT OF GUARDIAN ADVOCACY - ADA DIANE FUMICH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE BY MAIL - NOTICE OF PETITIONS FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN ADVOCATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - KEVIN R ALBAUM, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL - KEVIN ALBAUM, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 10-2-20 @11:00 VIDEO-CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO APPOINT TEMPORARY GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketReason: MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 10/02/2020 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketReason: GUARD_ADVOC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 10/23/2020 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION/APPOINT GUARDIAN - PATRICIA PARSONS KALLMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION/APPOINT GUARDIAN - HAROLD ERIC KALLMAN, JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketOATH GDN/DESIGNATION RES AGT/ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketOATH GDN/DESIGNATION RES AGT/ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPETITION APPOINT GUARDIAN - PERSON AND PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less