This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/03/2020 at 17:28:51 (UTC).

JONES STEWART, SYDNEY

Case Summary

On 12/19/2017 JONES STEWART, SYDNEY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN K STARGEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN K STARGEL

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

JONES, LEWIS DAVID

JONES, JEFFREY A.

Decedent

STEWART, SYDNEY JONES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - DCM $1,362.85

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketLETTER/MEMO - DCM/CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketORDER SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION-CLOSES SUMADM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING EXEMPT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketHOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY, PETITION TO DETERMINE EXEMPT PROPERTY- BAYCARE HEALTH SYSTEM INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE- PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION, PETITION TO DETERMINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketReason: PET FOR ADMIN AND HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 02/22/2018 09:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - FIFTH THIRD BANK - $2,163.26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketLETTER/MEMO - DCM SERVICES / CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (CERT.COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketREFUND FROM CLERK - $110.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketCONSENT/WAIVER OF NOTICE - JEFFREY A. JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketPETITION DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketPETITION DETERMINE EXEMPT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketPETITION SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION-OPENS SUMADM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less