This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 05/16/2023 at 22:11:42 (UTC).

JOHNSON ANGELO vs. HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/17/2023 JOHNSON ANGELO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HERITAGE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D SITES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D SITES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON, ANGELO

Defendant

HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOPEZ ANTHONY M

Defendant Attorney

BROEDER PAYDON

 

Court Documents

ORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - GENERAL

03/28/2023: ORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - GENERAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

03/31/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ENLARGMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLANT AND WRITTEN DISCOVERY PROPOUNDED

03/31/2023: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ENLARGMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLANT AND WRITTEN DISCOVERY PROPOUNDED

DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/07/2023: DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

UNDELIVERED ENVELOPE

04/12/2023: UNDELIVERED ENVELOPE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANTS PRIVILEGE LOG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS ANSERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDELIVERED ENVELOPE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • DocketTHEREWITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ENLARGMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLANT AND WRITTEN DISCOVERY PROPOUNDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - GENERAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • FinancialDate: 03/20/2023; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: EPORTAL - CIVIL LAW; Receipt Number: 9543516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketREQUEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONOF DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less