This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 03/07/2021 at 22:10:52 (UTC).

JOHN KEVIN COATS IRREV. TRUST AGRMT OF 4/2/2008

Case Summary

On 01/06/2021 JOHN KEVIN COATS IRREV TRUST AGRMT OF 4/2/2008 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD P HILL II. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GERALD P HILL II

 

Party Details

Interested Parties

GREEN, PATRICIA L

COATS, TRAVIS W

COATS, JOHN M

KOZAK, KATHLEEN A

Not Yet Classified

COATS, JOHN K

JOHN KEVIN COATS IRREV. TRUST AGRMT OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

MILLER MARK NELSON

P O Box 3

Lakeland, FL 33802

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketTRUST ORDER-CLOSES TRUST - ORDER FOR REFORMATION & MODIFICATION OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPATRICIA L. GREEN, KATHLEEN A. KOZAK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CONSENT TO RELIEF BY JOHN M COATS, TRAVIS W. COATS THROUGH JOHN KEVIN COATS (POA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketJOHN M. COATS, TRAVIS W. COATS % JOHN KEVIN COATS (POA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, PETITION FOR REFORMATION & MODIFICATION OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (COPY) - TRAVIS COATS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (COPY) - PATRICIA GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (COPY) - KATHLEEN KOZAK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (COPY) - JOHN M. COATS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketTRUST COMPLAINT-OPENS TRUST- PETITION FOR REFORMATION & MODIFICATION OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER, MARK NELSON