This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/05/2020 at 20:32:23 (UTC).

JG WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS LLC vs. LEAVENS R

Case Summary

On 03/21/2018 JG WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against LEAVENS R. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN RADABAUGH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN RADABAUGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JG WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS LLC

Defendant

LEAVENS R III

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL

07/02/2018: FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF HEARING AND NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF

05/15/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING AND NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF

NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION

05/11/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF HEARING AND NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF

04/30/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING AND NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING AND NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER

04/10/2018: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING AND NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER

AMENDED APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

04/10/2018: AMENDED APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

NOTICE OF HEARING AND NOTICE OF FILING APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED

04/04/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING AND NOTICE OF FILING APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED

APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

03/21/2018: APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/21/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • HearingCourt Date: 06/28/2018; Court Time: 1:30 PM; Location: BARTOW HRG RM 9B2 RED ELEVATOR; Motion: APP FOR COURT APPOVAL OF A TRANSFER OF -; Section: 15; Judge: JOHN RADABAUGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DispositionParty: R LEAVENS; Disposition Code: DAHO; Description: DISM AFT HRG OTHER; Date: 06/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketSTRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING AND NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketReason: APP FOR COURT APPOVAL OF A TRANSFER OF

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketOF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING AND NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketSETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING AND NOTICE OF FILING APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketReason: APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 04/27/2018 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • FinancialDate: 03/22/2018; Amount: 400.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: RICHARD THOMAS PETITT; Receipt Number: 7530309

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less