This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/19/2022 at 23:27:48 (UTC).

JESSIE WILLIE vs. SPRING LAKE NC LLC

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 JESSIE WILLIE filed an Other lawsuit against SPRING LAKE NC LLC. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WAYNE DURDEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WAYNE DURDEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIE JESSIE JR AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF ALGREE NEALY DECEASED

Defendants

SPRING LAKE NC LLC

3450 Ridgewood Road Nw

Atlanta, GA 30327

CLEAR CHOICE HEALTH CARE LLC

3450 Ridgewood Road Nw

Atlanta, GA 30327

SPK CAPITAL LLC

3450 Ridgewood Road Nw

Atlanta, GA 30327

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUPPENBERGER BRIAN C

801 N Orange Ave Ste 830

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

10/05/2021: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • DispositionParty: SPK CAPITAL LLC; Disposition Code: JDIS; Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE; Date: 12/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DispositionParty: CLEAR CHOICE HEALTH CARE LLC; Disposition Code: JDIS; Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE; Date: 12/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DispositionParty: SPRING LAKE NC LLC; Disposition Code: JDIS; Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE; Date: 12/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketAGREED ORDER ENFORCING ARBITRATION AGREEMENT AND DISMISSING LAWSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketORDER ON STIPULATION TO ENGAGE IN LIMITED DISCOVERY AS IT RELATES TO ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - GENERAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketPROCEEDINGS (AMENDED TO ADD EXIBIT A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND TO STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBIRTRATION WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- SPRING LAKE NC LLC DBA SPRING LAKE REHABILITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • FinancialDate: 10/21/2021; Amount: 430.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: COLLING GILBERT WRIGHT CARTER; Receipt Number: 8899439

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/SBK CAPITAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/CLEAR CHOICE HEALTH CARE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/SPRING LAKE NC LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO ALL DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPERANCE DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLEAR CHOICE HEALTH CARE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUPPENBERGER BRIAN C