This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/21/2022 at 04:21:03 (UTC).

JASPER CONTRACTORS INC vs. HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 JASPER CONTRACTORS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CATHERINE L COMBEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CATHERINE L COMBEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JASPER CONTRACTORS INC A/A/O RICH OLSZEWSKI

Defendant

HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES CARRINGTON E

924 N Magnolia Ave., Ste. 336

Orlando, FL 32803

Defendant Attorney

MCGEE JAMES B III

1401 N Westshore Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/05/2021: COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketDUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANTS FIELD ADJUSTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS PRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY PURSUANT TO RULE 1.720

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARNCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • FinancialDate: 10/07/2021; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: CARRINGTON E. JONES; Receipt Number: 8884159

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CANSUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARNANCE DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JASPER CONTRACTORS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONES CARRINGTON E