This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 00:54:00 (UTC).

ITURRALDE, BENITO ANTONIO

Case Summary

On 05/10/2018 ITURRALDE, BENITO ANTONIO was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN K STARGEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN K STARGEL

 

Party Details

Decedent

ITURRALDE, BENITO ANTONIO

Not Yet Classified

FARINA, SYLVIA

BRINK, MARIELA

ITURRALDE, JEFF A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE-CLOSES FORMAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 10/18/2019 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketWAIVER ACCT./SERVICE PET.DISCH./CONSENT/RECEIPT - MARIELA BRINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketWAIVER ACCT./SERVICE PET.DISCH./CONSENT/RECEIPT - JEFF ITURRALDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketWAIVER ACCT./SERVICE PET.DISCH./CONSENT/RECEIPT - SYLVIA FARINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketReason: CASE_MGMT_CONF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 10/18/2019 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - 10/18/2019, 10:00AM, 6B1, STARGEL

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (CERT.COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - CERTIFIED DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - OF ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE / CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT (E-FILED COPY) ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (E-FILED COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • DocketWAIVER-NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION - SYLVIA FARINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • DocketOATH PR/DESIGNATION RES AGENT/ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION-OPENS FORMAL

    Read MoreRead Less