This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 02/18/2022 at 07:53:48 (UTC).

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC vs. PINEIRO, MARGARITA

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PINEIRO, MARGARITA. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARY CATHERINE GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARY CATHERINE GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC

Defendants

PINEIRO, MARGARITA

Lakeland, FL 33815

DE ROSA, MARGARITA

NIEVES, MARGARITA

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO SMALL CLAIMS

06/16/2021: CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO SMALL CLAIMS

COMPLAINT

06/16/2021: COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO SMALL CLAIMS

06/16/2021: PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO SMALL CLAIMS

ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO SMALL CLAIMS

06/16/2021: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO SMALL CLAIMS

TRIAL MEMO / PRE-TRIAL MEMO

09/01/2021: TRIAL MEMO / PRE-TRIAL MEMO

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS DEFENDANT

09/01/2021: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF VIRTUAL MEDIATION

09/09/2021: NOTICE OF VIRTUAL MEDIATION

NOTICE OF VIRTUAL MEDIATION

09/09/2021: NOTICE OF VIRTUAL MEDIATION

ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

09/10/2021: ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • DispositionParty: MARGARITA PINEIRO; Disposition Code: JDIS; Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE; Date: 10/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketSETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REPORT AND COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketSETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REPORT AND COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 10/21/2021 02:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 10/21/2021 02:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2021
  • DocketReason: NTRL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 10/21/2021 02:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VIRTUAL MEDIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VIRTUAL MEDIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE- MARGARITA PINEIRO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO SMALL CLAIMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO SMALL CLAIMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE- MARGARITA PINEIRO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE- MARGARITA PINEIRO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO SMALL CLAIMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC is a litigant