This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 05/27/2022 at 22:01:56 (UTC).

INTERACTIVE FINANCIAL MARKETING GROUP vs. KELLEY BUICK GMC INC DBA KELLEY LAKELAND USED TRUCK STORE

Case Summary

On 03/28/2022 INTERACTIVE FINANCIAL MARKETING GROUP filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against KELLEY BUICK GMC INC DBA KELLEY LAKELAND USED TRUCK STORE. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN M KOHL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEVIN M KOHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERACTIVE FINANCIAL MARKETING GROUP

1509 West Main Street

Richmond, VA 23220

Defendant

KELLEY BUICK GMC INC DBA KELLEY LAKELAND USED TRUCK STORE

C/O Robert Sammons Esq Ra, 1556 Sixth Street Se

Winter Haven, FL 33880

 

Court Documents

LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

03/28/2022: LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

AFFIDAVIT JUDGMENT FOREIGN

03/28/2022: AFFIDAVIT JUDGMENT FOREIGN

JUDGMENT FOREIGN

03/28/2022: JUDGMENT FOREIGN

NOTICE OF RECORDATION

03/29/2022: NOTICE OF RECORDATION

SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - KELLEY BUICK GMC INC DBA KELLEY LAKELAND USED TRUCK STORE

04/04/2022: SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - KELLEY BUICK GMC INC DBA KELLEY LAKELAND USED TRUCK STORE

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF CERTIFIED MAILING OF ITS NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT

04/11/2022: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF CERTIFIED MAILING OF ITS NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketTO KELLEY BUICK GMC INC DBA KELLEY LAKELAND USED TRUCK STORE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF CERTIFIED MAILING OF ITS NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketTO KELLEY BUICK GMC INC DBA KELLEY LAKELAND USED TRUCK STORE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF CERTIFIED MAILING OF ITS NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketTO KELLEY BUICK GMC INC DBA KELLEY LAKELAND USED TRUCK STORE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF CERTIFIED MAILING OF ITS NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - KELLEY BUICK GMC INC DBA KELLEY LAKELAND USED TRUCK STORE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - KELLEY BUICK GMC INC DBA KELLEY LAKELAND USED TRUCK STORE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - KELLEY BUICK GMC INC DBA KELLEY LAKELAND USED TRUCK STORE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECORDATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DispositionParty: KELLEY BUICK GMC INC DBA KELLEY LAKELAND USED TRUCK STORE; Disposition Code: OTHR; Description: OTHER; Date: 03/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • FinancialDate: 03/28/2022; Amount: 557.74; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP; Receipt Number: 9095213

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOREIGN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT JUDGMENT FOREIGN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less