This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 19:12:00 (UTC).

HUBER MICHELE vs. SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 HUBER MICHELE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WAYNE DURDEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WAYNE DURDEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUBER, MICHELE

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Chief Fincial Officer As Ra, 200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABARAY GREGORY P

5835 Us Hwy 98 S

Lakeland, FL 33812

Defendant Attorney

MILLER CHANDRA L

P.O. Box 90

St Petersburg, FL 33731

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • HearingCourt Date: 07/06/2020; Court Time: 10:30 AM; Location: BARTOW HRG RM 9B2 RED ELEVATOR; Motion: CASE_MGMT_CONF - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Section: 11; Judge: WAYNE DURDEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketReason: CASE_MGMT_CONF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 07/06/2020 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF MICHELE HUBER NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF, MICHELE HUBER, NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketDISCOVERY REQUESTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E- MAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY BY SERIVNG DEE GARVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialDate: 02/03/2020; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: LAW OFFICES OF ALLEN AND ABARA; Receipt Number: 8256360

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less