This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Polk County on 02/16/2022 at 21:30:37 (UTC).

HONEST HOSPITALITY DAVENPORT, LLC vs. GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 HONEST HOSPITALITY DAVENPORT, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Polk County, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WAYNE DURDEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WAYNE DURDEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HONEST HOSPITALITY DAVENPORT, LLC

221 Aragon Ave., Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant

GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

1111 Ashworth Road

West Des Moines, IA 50265-3538

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ENRIGUEZ MARIO LUIS

221 Aragon Avenue Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant Attorney

BROWNELL REBECCA A

Po Box 14503

Des Moines, IA 50306

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

04/06/2021: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketAGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 12/06/2021; Court Time: 10:00 AM; Location: CIVIL DIVISION 11 VIRTUAL; Motion: CASE_MGMT_CONF - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Section: 11; Judge: WAYNE DURDEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DispositionParty: GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Disposition Code: DAHO; Description: DISM AFT HRG OTHER; Date: 12/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketAGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketPLLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketReason: CASE_MGMT_CONF

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • FinancialDate: 04/08/2021; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: MANUEL RAMIREZ; Receipt Number: 8673250

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWNELL REBECCA