This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Polk County on 02/24/2021 at 13:31:57 (UTC).

HOF I LEGAL TITLE TRUST 4 US BANK TRUST NATIONA vs. SILVERA JOSE LOUIS

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 HOF I LEGAL TITLE TRUST 4 US BANK TRUST NATIONA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SILVERA JOSE LOUIS. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Polk County, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEVEN L SELPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEVEN L SELPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOF I LEGAL TITLE TRUST 4 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE

225 Robinson Street Suite 660

Orlando, FL 32812

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

Davenport, FL 33837-

PROVICENCE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

Davenport, FL 33837-

SILVERA JOSE LOUIS

Orlando, FL 32809

SILVERA CORNELIA

Davenport, FL 33837-

PROVIDENCE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COLLINS SARA

225 E Robinson St, Suite 155

Orlando, FL 32801

VANHOOK NICHOLAS J

225 E Robinson Street Ste 155

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorney

KLEINFELDT ROBERT J

390 N Orange Ave., Ste. 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ JOSE LOUIS SILVERA

11/02/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ JOSE LOUIS SILVERA

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

11/02/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

11/02/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ PROVIDENCE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

11/02/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ PROVIDENCE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ CORNELIA SILVERA AKA C SILVERA

11/02/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ CORNELIA SILVERA AKA C SILVERA

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

11/02/2020: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

11/30/2020: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

12/14/2020: AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION TO DISMISS WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW

12/22/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 03/16/2021; Court Time: 1:45 PM; Location: BARTOW HRG RM 7D1 BLUE ELEVATOR; Motion: MOT_DISMISS - MOTION TO DISMISS; Section: 08; Judge: STEVEN L SELPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketReason: MOT_DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 03/16/2021 01:45 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DispositionParty: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2; Disposition Code: OTHR; Description: OTHER; Date: 01/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DispositionParty: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1; Disposition Code: OTHR; Description: OTHER; Date: 01/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT-UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1-UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY AND DESIGNATION OF E MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE OF PAPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ JOSE LOUIS SILVERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOF I LEGAL TITLE TRUST 3, U.S. BANK TRUST NA ASSN is a litigant

Latest cases where PROVIDENCE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT KLEINFELDT