Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 04/22/2021 at 20:00:54 (UTC).

HAINES CITY HMA LLC DBA HEART OF FLORIDA REGIONAL vs. AMARO, JESSICA

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 HAINES CITY HMA LLC DBA HEART OF FLORIDA REGIONAL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMARO, JESSICA. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN M KOHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEVIN M KOHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAINES CITY HMA LLC DBA HEART OF FLORIDA REGIONAL

1980 Michigan Ave.

Cocoa, FL 32922

Defendant

AMARO, JESSICA

Winter Haven,, FL 33880

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE TROY R

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

04/08/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/08/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 05/18/2021; Court Time: 1:30 PM; Location: BARTOW SMALL CLAIMS/EVICTIONS VIRTUAL; Motion: PRTC - PRE-TRIAL HEARING; Section: M2; Judge: KEVIN M KOHL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketVIRTUAL/VIDEO SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR- JESSICA AMARO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialDate: 04/09/2021; Amount: 185.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: TROY LOTANE ONE; Receipt Number: 8675009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketReason: PRTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 05/18/2021 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAINES CITY HMA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R