This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 04/29/2023 at 22:08:57 (UTC).

GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs. CEDENO, WILFREDO RAMOS

Case Summary

On 02/28/2023 GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CEDENO, WILFREDO RAMOS. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARY CATHERINE GREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00LK

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARY CATHERINE GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

GTE FINANCIAL,

Defendants

CEDENO, WILFREDO RAMOS

WARD, KELLI A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOUCH JEFFREY J

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

02/28/2023: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - WILFREDO RAMOS CEDENO

02/28/2023: SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - WILFREDO RAMOS CEDENO

EXPARTE MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

04/20/2023: EXPARTE MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • HearingCourt Date: 04/24/2023; Court Time: 10:00 AM; Location: LAKELAND GOVERNMENT CENTER; Motion: PRTC - PRE-TRIAL HEARING; Section: L1; Judge: MARY CATHERINE GREEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketTRIAL MEMO / PRE-TRIAL MEMO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS UNSERVED / KELLI WARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS UNSERVED / WILFREDO RAMOS CEDENO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • FinancialDate: 02/28/2023; Amount: 320.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: EPORTAL - CIVIL LAW; Receipt Number: 9516525

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - KELLI A WARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - WILFREDO RAMOS CEDENO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK) - KELLI A WARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK) - WILFREDO RAMOS CEDENO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketReason: PRTC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 04/24/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less