This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/03/2020 at 20:10:54 (UTC).

GRUBBS, JENNA CHRISTINE

Case Summary

On 12/28/2017 GRUBBS, JENNA CHRISTINE was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN K STARGEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN K STARGEL

 

Party Details

Guardian Ad Litems

GRUBBS, STACY ALLISON

GRUBBS, GARY LAMAR

Interested Parties and Guardian Ad Litems

GRUBBS, GARY LAMAR

GRUBBS, STACEY ALLISON

Not Yet Classified

GRUBBS, JENNA CHRISTINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Guardian Ad Litem and Interested Party Attorney

PHILLIPS AMY L

601 W Central Avenue

Winter Haven, FL 33880

Not Yet Classified Attorney

OTTO WALTER ALFRED JR.

Attorney at OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

Office Of Regional Counsel, P.O. Box 9000 Drawer Rc2

Bartow, FL 33831-9000

Other Attorneys

OTTO, WALTER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketORDER APPROVING ANNUAL GUARDIANSHIP PLAN (SEQ #34)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketCLERK ANNUAL PLAN REVIEW FROM 03/01/19 - 02/28/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketANNUAL GUARDIANSHIP PLAN FROM 3-1-19 TO 2-28-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketORDER APPROVING INITIAL GUARDIANSHIP INVENTORY (SEQ. # 23)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketCLERK ACCOUNTING AUDIT (VERIFIED INVENTORY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketORDER APPROVING INITIAL GUARDIANSHIP PLAN (SEQ. # 24)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketORDER DISCHARGING REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketORDER WAIVING ANNUAL ACCOUNTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketCLERK INITIAL PLAN REVIEW FROM 02/02/18 - 02/28/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketMOTION TO DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketCLERK'S DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING REPORT OF ATTENDING PHYSICIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketGUARDIAN'S EDUCATION REQUIREMENT CERTIFICATE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLETION GUARDIAN EDUC STACEY GRUBBS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketGUARDIAN'S EDUCATION REQUIREMENT CERTIFICATE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLETION GUARDIAN EDUC GARY L GRUBBS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING WITH ATTACHED SCHOOL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION/APPOINT GUARDIAN - STACEY ALLISON PIERCE GRUBBS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION/APPOINT GUARDIAN - GARY LAMAR GRUBBS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketOATH GDN/DESIGNATION RES AGT/ACCEPTANCE - STACEY ALLISON PIERCE GRUBBS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketOATH GDN/DESIGNATION RES AGT/ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketPETITION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN-OPENS PLENRY

    Read MoreRead Less