This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/06/2020 at 13:57:24 (UTC).

GOOLSBY, DAISY M.

Case Summary

On 04/16/2018 GOOLSBY, DAISY M was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN K STARGEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN K STARGEL

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

GOOLSBY, LOUISE

Decedent

GOOLSBY, DAISY M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketSATISFACTION - ASCENSIONPOINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • DocketLETTER/MEMO - ASCENSIONPOINT/CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketFULL SATISFACTION OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM OF WELLS FARGO BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING FULL SATISFACTION OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM OF WELLS FARGO BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM- WELLS FARGO BANK SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO WACHOVIA $1,353.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM- ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES WALMART $1,982.81

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE / CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketRECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY & CONSENT TO DISCHARGE - LOUISE GOOLSBY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketORDER SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION-CLOSES SUMADM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE- PHILLIP E. KUHN ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (CERT.COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT (E-FILED COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (E-FILED COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketPETITION SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION-OPENS SUMADM

    Read MoreRead Less