This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/05/2020 at 15:13:27 (UTC).

GINN STEVEN B vs. GINN LAURIE A

Case Summary

On 03/08/2018 GINN STEVEN B filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GINN LAURIE A. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GINN STEVEN B

Defendant

GINN LAURIE A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketANSWER / RESPONSE LAURIE GINN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE LAURIE GINN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FINANCIAL- LAURIE ANN GINN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketReason: FH_DOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 04/30/2018 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FINANCIAL - STEVEN B GINN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less