This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/11/2020 at 16:59:45 (UTC).

GIBBS DIANE vs. UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/31/2018 GIBBS DIANE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WAYNE DURDEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WAYNE DURDEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GIBBS DIANE

GIBBS JAMES

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

1110 W Commercial Blvd

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33309

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

12/03/2018: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK / UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

11/01/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK / UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

10/31/2018: NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

COMPLAINT

10/31/2018: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/31/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • DispositionParty: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Disposition Code: DBHO; Description: DISM BEF HRG OTHER; Date: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE/REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFFS DIANE GIBBS AND JAMES GIBBS VERIFIED RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • FinancialDate: 11/01/2018; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: MORGAN & MORGAN, P.A.; Receipt Number: 7768253

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK / UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketREQUESTS FOR ADMISSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less