This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/02/2020 at 16:36:43 (UTC).

GARDNER, ROBERT DEAN

Case Summary

On 11/06/2017 GARDNER, ROBERT DEAN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN K STARGEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN K STARGEL

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

DRAWDY, TAMI LEE

DAY, MARIA

DRAWDY, JOSHUA

WALKER, GEREMY

ODETTE, KATY

GARDNER, CHRISTOPHER

HYVONEN, TIFFANY

FISCHESSER, JESSICA

GARDNER, JANELLE

WOLFE, SCOT ALAN

ODETTE, GERI L

BYRD, HEATHER

GARDNER, TERRY

KREUGER, TAMERA

GARDNER, KARL

GARDNER, DIANNA

GARDNER, PATRICK

GARDNER, MATTHEW

CONNER, TINA

Decedent

GARDNER, ROBERT DEAN

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Not Yet Classified Attorney

VAN VOORHEES TYLER S

Po Box 120280

Clermont, FL 34712-0280

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 10/18/2019 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketPETITION EXTEND TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketReason: CASE_MGMT_CONF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 10/18/2019 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - 10/18/2019, 10:00AM, 6B1, STARGEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketDELINQUENT LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 10/19/2018 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION-NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS & INTERESTED PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION-NOTICE TO CREDITORS / AND / NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketPROOF SERVICE NOTICE OF ADMIN ATT/RECEIPTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (CERT.COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT E-FILED COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketOATH PR/DESIGNATION RES AGENT/ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketPETITION DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketPETITION WAIVE BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION-OPENS FORMAL

    Read MoreRead Less