This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 03/07/2023 at 19:36:38 (UTC).

GARCIA STEVEN vs. FARRER DONALD

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 GARCIA STEVEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FARRER DONALD. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P MCDANIEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL P MCDANIEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA, STEVEN

Defendants

FARRER, DONALD

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BISHOP JAMES G

Defendant Attorney

MERCER DAVID A

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/10/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/10/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

COMPLAINT

08/10/2022: COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF FILING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASE NOS 2022CA-002757 2022CA-002758 AND 2022CA-

09/15/2022: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF FILING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASE NOS 2022CA-002757 2022CA-002758 AND 2022CA-

COPY OF AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ASE NOS. 2022CA-002757, 2022CA-002758

09/21/2022: COPY OF AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ASE NOS. 2022CA-002757, 2022CA-002758

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF DEATH - STEVEN GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketNOTICE FOR TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketAND 2022CA-002761

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ASE NOS. 2022CA-002757, 2022CA-002758

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • Docket002761

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF FILING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASE NOS 2022CA-002757 2022CA-002758 AND 2022CA-

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - GENERAL TRACK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT FRONTIER FLORIDA LLCS ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED/DONALD FARRER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • FinancialDate: 08/10/2022; Amount: 420.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: EPORTAL - CIVIL LAW; Receipt Number: 9275995

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- DONALD FARRER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less