This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 05/05/2023 at 22:03:39 (UTC).

GARCIA, LOHENDY vs. AMERICAN TRADITIONS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/06/2023 GARCIA, LOHENDY filed an Other lawsuit against AMERICAN TRADITIONS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRANDON J RAFOOL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRANDON J RAFOOL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARCIA, LOHENDY

GARCIA, AMAURIS

Defendant

AMERICAN TRADITIONS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERNANDEZ SEAN E

Defendant Attorney

EWIN DANIEL J

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

03/06/2023: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- AMERICAN TRADITIONS INSURANCE COMPANY

03/07/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- AMERICAN TRADITIONS INSURANCE COMPANY

SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED

03/10/2023: SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO FLA R JUD ADMIN 2.516

04/04/2023: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO FLA R JUD ADMIN 2.516

 

Docket Entries

09/12/2023

HearingCourt Date: 09/12/2023; Court Time: 10:30 AM; Location: GENERAL CIVIL VIRTUAL; Motion: STAT -; Section: M9; Judge: BRANDON J RAFOOL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023

DocketJOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO FLA R JUD ADMIN 2.516

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

DocketORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - GENERAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

DocketReason: STAT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

DocketCalendar entry added for: 09/12/2023 10:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2023

DocketAMERICAN TRADITIONS INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023

FinancialDate: 03/07/2023; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: EPORTAL - CIVIL LAW; Receipt Number: 9525678

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- AMERICAN TRADITIONS INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023

DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023

DocketPLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023

DocketNOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less