This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/16/2022 at 23:44:44 (UTC).

FULLER BRENDA vs. LEWIS SAMUEL R

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 FULLER BRENDA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LEWIS SAMUEL R. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CATHERINE L COMBEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CATHERINE L COMBEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FULLER, BRENDA

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendants

GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

2280 N. Greenville Avenu

Richardson, TX 75082

LEWIS, SAMUEL R

Winter Haven, FL 33884

ALLSTATE FIRE & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

2775 Sanders Road

Northbrook, IL 60062

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORAN MARY K

20 N Orange Ave Suite 1600

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorneys

LEE KIMBERLY J

4300 W. Cypress St., Ste. 900

Tampa, FL 33607

RUSS JESSICA D

4443 Lyons Rd Ste 206

Coconut Creek, FL 33073

WORDEN JENNIFER C

2935 First Avenue North 2Nd Floor

St Petersburg, FL 33713

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

11/09/2021: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION VIA ZOOM VIDEOCONFERENCING AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/08/2021: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION VIA ZOOM VIDEOCONFERENCING AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DEFENDANT NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

09/07/2021: DEFENDANT NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

DEFENDANTS ANSWER O COMPLAINT

07/06/2021: DEFENDANTS ANSWER O COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

04/13/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

04/13/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ SAMUEL R LEWIS

04/13/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ SAMUEL R LEWIS

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT ALLSTATE FIRE & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

04/12/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT ALLSTATE FIRE & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

04/12/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT SAMUEL R LEWIS

04/12/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT SAMUEL R LEWIS

PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

04/12/2021: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT GIECO MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

04/12/2021: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT GIECO MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT SAMUEL R LEWIS

04/12/2021: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT SAMUEL R LEWIS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT ALLSTATE FIRE & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

04/12/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT ALLSTATE FIRE & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

04/12/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT SAMUEL R LEWIS

04/12/2021: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT SAMUEL R LEWIS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

04/12/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT

04/12/2021: COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • HearingCourt Date: 02/23/2022; Court Time: 9:00 AM; Location: CIVIL DIVISION 07 VIRTUAL; Motion: MOT_DISMISS - MOTION TO DISMISS; Section: 07; Judge: CATHERINE L COMBEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM NON PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF BRENDA FULLERS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASULATY INSURANCE COMPANYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PLAINTIFFS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketReason: MOT_DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 02/23/2022 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT SAMUEL R LEWIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT GIECO MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT SAMUEL R LEWIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT ALLSTATE FIRE & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT SAMUEL R LEWIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORAN, MARY KATHLEEN