This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/02/2020 at 22:09:54 (UTC).

FLECKENSTEIN, FRANK P.

Case Summary

On 11/20/2017 FLECKENSTEIN, FRANK P was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN K STARGEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN K STARGEL

 

Party Details

Decedent

FLECKENSTEIN, FRANK P.

Not Yet Classified

SACKS, BETTY LYNN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE-CLOSES FORMAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketINVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketWAIVER ACCT./SERVICE PET.DISCH./CONSENT/RECEIPT - BETTY LYNN SACHS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketREPORT OF DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL & APPOINTING PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (CERT.COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE / CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketOATH TO WILL/WITNESS NOT FOUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketOATH PR/DESIGNATION RES AGENT/ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION-OPENS FORMAL

    Read MoreRead Less