This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 02/20/2022 at 13:40:16 (UTC).

FIRST FRANKLIN MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE LOAN vs. CACERES JUAN S

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 FIRST FRANKLIN MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE LOAN filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CACERES JUAN S. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WAYNE DURDEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WAYNE DURDEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST FRANKLIN MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST MORTAGAGE LOAN ASSET BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2007-FFC US BANK

225 Robinson Street Suite 660

Orlando, FL 32812

Defendants

CACERES, JUAN S

Haines City, FL 33844

RANDA RIDGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

5121 S Lakeland Dr Ste 1

Lakeland, FL 33813

THE CLERK OF THE COURT OF POLK COUNTY FLORIDA

255 N Broadway Ave

Bartow, FL 33830

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

Haines City, FL 33844

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

Haines City, FL 33844

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JUAN S CACERES

Haines City, FL 33844

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS SARA

225 E Robinson St, Suite 155

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorneys

MARTIN ANTONIO G

1420 Celebration Blvd Ste 303

Celebration, FL 34747

MALDONADO DAVID

Po Box 5991

Lakeland, FL 33807

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JUAN S CACERES

11/23/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JUAN S CACERES

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

11/23/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN TENANAT IN POSSESSION 1

11/23/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN TENANAT IN POSSESSION 1

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ THE CLERK OF THE COURT OF POLK COUNTY FLORIDA

11/23/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ THE CLERK OF THE COURT OF POLK COUNTY FLORIDA

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ RANDA RIDGE HOMEOWENRS ASSOCIATION INC

11/23/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ RANDA RIDGE HOMEOWENRS ASSOCIATION INC

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ JUAN S CACERES

11/23/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ JUAN S CACERES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/22/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

11/22/2021: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

11/22/2021: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

11/22/2021: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

01/07/2022: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE

01/12/2022: NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • FinancialDate: 01/11/2022; Amount: 18.50; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: EPORTAL - CIVIL LAW; Receipt Number: 8990304

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DispositionParty: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JUAN S CACERES; Disposition Code: OTHR; Description: OTHER; Date: 01/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DispositionParty: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2; Disposition Code: OTHR; Description: OTHER; Date: 01/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DispositionParty: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1; Disposition Code: OTHR; Description: OTHER; Date: 01/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketPOSSESSION 1- UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANTS -UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JUAN S CACERES- UNKNOWN TENANT IN

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN TENANAT IN POSSESSION 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JUAN S CACERES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST FRANKLIN MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE LOAN ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2007 FFC is a litigant

Latest cases where Clerk of the Court of Brwd Cty is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLLINS SARA