This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/04/2020 at 13:22:08 (UTC).

FERRER YAHIRA V vs. FERRER DAVID

Case Summary

On 01/19/2018 FERRER YAHIRA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against vs FERRER DAVID. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES A YANCEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES A YANCEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERRER YAHIRA V

Defendant

FERRER DAVID

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED DAVID FERRER 01/25/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED DAVID FERRER 01/25/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketReason: TEMP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 01/29/2018 08:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketSERVICE PACKET TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketINJUNCTION APPROVAL SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less