This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 10/07/2020 at 20:07:18 (UTC).

FENLEY ANGELA vs. FENLEY MELANIE (DECEASED)

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 FENLEY ANGELA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against FENLEY MELANIE DECEASED. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FENLEY ANGELA

Defendants

FENLEY MELANIE (DECEASED)

FENLEY JACOB (DECEASED)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SHELTON SHELLEY HARRELL

146 Ave B Nw

Winter Haven, FL 33881

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketReason: EMERG_HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 10/05/2020 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketAMENDED EMERGENCY MOTION TO INTERVENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO INTERVENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketORDER REGARDING EMERGENCY EX PARTE RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketEMERGENCY PETITION FOR TEMPORARY CUSTODY BY EXTENDED FAMILY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketFAMILY MEMO TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less