This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Polk County on 10/17/2021 at 22:05:25 (UTC).

EQUITYMAX, INC. vs. WASHINGTON BRUCE M.

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 EQUITYMAX, INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WASHINGTON BRUCE M. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Polk County, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DANA Y MOORE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DANA Y MOORE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUITYMAX INC

Defendants

WASHINGTON BRUCE M SR

Lake Alfred, FL 33850

LAKE VAN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

2108 E. Edgewood Dr

Lakeland, FL 33803

THE STATE OF FLORIDA

Pl-01 The Capitol

Tallahassee, FL 32399

UNKNOWN TENANT

Aburndale, FL 33823

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRECO WILLIAM A

499 Nw 70 Ave Ste 112

Plantation, FL 33317

Defendant Attorney

JONES HASTINGS

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Office Of The Attorney General, The Capitol, Suite Pl-01

Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

 

Court Documents

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

08/18/2021: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

VERIFIED COMPLAINT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

08/18/2021: VERIFIED COMPLAINT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

08/18/2021: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/18/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketSTATE OF FLORIDAS ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE AND SUMMONS LAKE VAN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • FinancialDate: 09/02/2021; Amount: 40.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: TEPPS TRECO; Receipt Number: 8844233

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- BRUCE M WASHINGTON SR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- STATE OF FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK -UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- LAKE VAN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • FinancialDate: 08/20/2021; Amount: 910.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: TEPPS TRECO; Receipt Number: 8829480

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Equitymax Inc Pension Plan is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Treco, William A