This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 07/05/2022 at 22:03:59 (UTC).

EAST, DOLONY vs. TR ROOFING LLC

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 EAST, DOLONY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TR ROOFING LLC. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARY CATHERINE GREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARY CATHERINE GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EAST, DOLONY

Haines City, FL 33844

TR ROOFING LLC (COUNTER)

Defendants

TR ROOFING LLC

301 N 23Rd St

Haines City, FL 33844

EAST, DOLONY (COUNTER)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MARTIN ANTONIO G

1420 Celebration Blvd Ste 200

Celebration, FL 34747

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/06/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - TR ROOFING LLC

05/06/2022: SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - TR ROOFING LLC

SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - TR ROOFING LLC

05/12/2022: SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - TR ROOFING LLC

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/20/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

06/03/2022: ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

LETTER FROM CLERK REQUESTING COUNTERCLAIM FEES

06/07/2022: LETTER FROM CLERK REQUESTING COUNTERCLAIM FEES

TRIAL MEMO / PRE-TRIAL MEMO

06/08/2022: TRIAL MEMO / PRE-TRIAL MEMO

MEDIATION NON-AGREEMENT

06/08/2022: MEDIATION NON-AGREEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • HearingCourt Date: 08/18/2022; Court Time: 9:00 AM; Location: BARTOW HRG RM 8D1 BLUE ELEVATOR; Motion: NTRL - NON JURY TRIAL; Section: M2; Judge: MARY CATHERINE GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO AMEND STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketReason: NTRL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 08/18/2022 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • HearingCourt Date: 06/08/2022; Court Time: 8:30 AM; Location: BARTOW 5 B RED ELEVATOR; Motion: PRTC - PRE-TRIAL HEARING; Section: M2; Judge: MARY CATHERINE GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • FinancialDate: 06/08/2022; Amount: 295.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: ANTONIO MARTIN; Receipt Number: 9191411; Receipt Number: 2022000526

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION NON-AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRIAL MEMO / PRE-TRIAL MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • FinancialDate: 06/07/2022; Amount: 295.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: ANTONIO MARTIN ESQUIRE; Receipt Number; Receipt Number: 2022000526

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK REQUESTING COUNTERCLAIM FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - TR ROOFING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • FinancialDate: 05/06/2022; Amount: 317.50; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: DOLONY EAST; Receipt Number: 9149101

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - TR ROOFING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketReason: PRTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 06/08/2022 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin, Antonio Giovonnie