This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 03/07/2023 at 17:33:17 (UTC).

DUKE ENERGY FLORIDA LLC vs. VERIZON BUSINESS NETWORK SERVICES

Case Summary

On 08/05/2022 DUKE ENERGY FLORIDA LLC filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against VERIZON BUSINESS NETWORK SERVICES. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES A YANCEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5F00

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES A YANCEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUKE ENERGY FLORIDA LLC

Defendants

VERIZON BUSINESS NETWORK SERVICES, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION FKA MCI TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION

BYNUM FAMILY PARTNERSHIP, A FLORIDA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP

UNKNOWN TENANTS AND OTHER PARTIES IN POSSESSION

UNKNOWN HEIRS OR BENEFICIARIES

JOE G. TEDDER, POLK COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VILARET MANNY R

Defendant Attorneys

TABANO STEPHEN

LUDOVICI LORENA HART

MORRIS TINESHIA D

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF TAKING

08/10/2022: DECLARATION OF TAKING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/10/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- VERIZON BUSINESS NETWORK SERVICES INC A DELAWRE CORPORATION FKA MCI

08/12/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- VERIZON BUSINESS NETWORK SERVICES INC A DELAWRE CORPORATION FKA MCI

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- BYNUM FAMILY PARTNERSHIP A FLORIDA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP

08/12/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- BYNUM FAMILY PARTNERSHIP A FLORIDA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP

NOTICE OF DESIGNATED E-MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

08/10/2022: NOTICE OF DESIGNATED E-MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

AFFIDAVIT SUPPORTING CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/10/2022: AFFIDAVIT SUPPORTING CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

08/10/2022: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

08/12/2022: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

12/06/2022: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

 

Docket Entries

02/27/2023

DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 03/20/2023 09:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023

DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 03/06/2023 09:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023

DocketTHIRD AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023

DocketReason: OT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023

DocketCalendar entry added for: 03/20/2023 09:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023

DocketReason: PRE OT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023

DocketCalendar entry added for: 03/06/2023 09:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023

DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 02/09/2023 09:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023

DocketNOTICE OF ORDER OF TAKING HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023

DocketReason: OT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
08/10/2022

DocketNOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022

DocketPETITIONERS MOTION TO REGULATE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022

DocketPETITIONER'S NOTICE OF FILING SURVEYS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022

DocketPETITION IN EMINENT DOMAIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022

DocketNOTICE TO FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AND WATER MANAGEMENT DISTRICT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATED E-MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022

DocketPETITIONERS MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDECLARATION OF TAKING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT SUPPORTING CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE OF PROCESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less