This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 05/21/2022 at 22:06:09 (UTC).

DUKE ENERGY FLORIDA, LLC D/B/A DUKE ENERGY vs. LANDMARK INVESTMENTS INC

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 DUKE ENERGY FLORIDA, LLC D/B/A DUKE ENERGY filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against LANDMARK INVESTMENTS INC. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES A YANCEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************3T00

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES A YANCEY

 

Party Details

Defendants

LANDMARK INVESTMENTS INC

2500 Dundee Road

Winterhaven, FL 33884

TAMPA ELECTRIC COMPANY

Po Box 111

Tampa, FL 33601

GROVELAKE S.C. COMPANY

C/O Clifford L Walters, Esq, Po Box 469

Bradenton, FL 33506

CENTERLANDS PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

722 Shore Drive East

Oldsmar, FL 34677

SWAIN N SHAW REAL ESTATE AND DEVELOPMENT INC

8802 Wood Creek Circle, Po Box 1692

Riverview, FL 33569

THE SWAIN COMPANIES INC

C/O Snow E Martin Jr, 200 Lake Morton Dr

Lakeland, FL 33801

NEW EMGLAND MUTUAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

501 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02117

SLS ASSOCIATES

Po Box 3096

Winterhaven, FL 33883

THE CITY OF WINTERHAVEN

451 Third St Nw

Winterhaven, FL

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

605 Suwannee Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399-0450

WINBRAN INC

2465 Mcmullen Booth Road

Clearwater, FL 33759

VOYA INSURANCE AND ANNUITY COMPANY

400 E Court Ave

Des Moines, IA 50309

RACETRAC PETROLEUM INC

200 Galleria Parkway Se, Suite 900

Atlanta, GA 30339

NATIONAL PROPERTIES TRUST INC

2465 Mcmullen Booth Road

Clearwater, FL 33759

STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY

19225 Nw Tanasbourne Dr

Hillsboro, OR 97124

CLAYTON S DUERR AND LOUISE S DUERR ( AND HEIRS AND ASSIGNS)

LOUISE S DUERR (AND HEIRS AND ASSIGNS)

UNKNOWN TENANTS AND OTHER PARTIES IN POSSESSION

UNKNOWN HEIRS OR BENEFICIARIES

TEDDER JOE AS TAX COLLECTOR

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WERDINE FRED S

4301 W Boy Scout Blvd Suite 300

Tampa, FL 33607

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2022
  • HearingCourt Date: 06/20/2022; Court Time: 9:00 AM; Location: CIVIL DIVISION 08 VIRTUAL; Motion: PRE OT -; Section: 08; Judge: JAMES A YANCEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPETITIONER DUKE ENERGY FLORIDA LLC DBA DUKE ENERGY WITNESS LIST FOR ORDER OF TAKING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketPETITIONER DUKE ENERGY FLORIDA LLC NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT/PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT/PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketEMINENT DOMAIN ORDER OF TAKING HEARING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketORDER REGULATING SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketReason: PRE OT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 06/20/2022 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketPETITIONERS NOTICE OF FILING SURVEYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketPETITION IN EMINENT DOMAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF ENVIROMENTAL PROTECTION AND WATER MANAGEMENT DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketPETITIONERS MOTION TO REGULATE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketPETITIONERS MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDECLARATION OF TAKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT SUPPORTING CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GROVELAKE S.C. COMPANY is a litigant