This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Polk County on 02/20/2022 at 15:45:40 (UTC).

DUKE ENERGY FLORIDA, LLC D/B/A DUKE ENERGY vs. AUTOZONE INC

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 DUKE ENERGY FLORIDA, LLC D/B/A DUKE ENERGY filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against AUTOZONE INC. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Polk County, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES A YANCEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************6T00

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES A YANCEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUKE ENERGY FLORIDA, LLC D/B/A DUKE ENERGY

Defendants

AUTOZONE INC

Po Box 21987Dept 8088

Memphis, TN 38101

SOUTHWEST FLORIDA WATER MANAGEMENT DISTRICT

2379 Broad Street

Brooksville, FL 34604

UNKNOWN HEIRS OR BENEFICIARIES

UNKNOWN TENANTS AND OTHER PARTIES IN POSSESSION

TEDDER JOE AS TAX COLLECTOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WERDINE FRED S

4301 W Boy Scout Blvd Suite 300

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

LE ROUX JOHN M

26133 Us Highway 19 Nsuite 300

Clearwater, FL 33763

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • HearingCourt Date: 02/17/2022; Court Time: 9:00 AM; Location: BARTOW HRG RM 7C1 BLUE ELEVATOR; Motion: OT -; Section: 08; Judge: JAMES A YANCEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketReason: OT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 02/17/2022 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 02/07/2022 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF ORDER OF TAKING HEARINGS ON FEBRUARY 7, 8, 9 AND 26, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • HearingCourt Date: 01/31/2022; Court Time: 9:30 AM; Location: CIVIL DIVISION 08 VIRTUAL; Motion: PRE OT -; Section: 08; Judge: JAMES A YANCEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketOF TAKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketMOTIONS FILED PURSUANT TO OCTOBER 14 2021 ORDER SETTING EMINENT DOMAIN PRE ORDER OF TAKING AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDUKE ENERGY FLORIDA LLCS SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST EXHIBIT LIST ISSUES FOR ORDER OF TAKING AND

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketPETITIONERS MOTION TO REGULATE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF ENVIROMENTAL PROTECTION AND WATER MANAGEMENT DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketDECLARATION OF TAKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT SUPPPORTING CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketPETITIONERS MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketPETITION IN EMINENT DOMAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketPETITIONERS NOTICE OF FILING SURVEYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Southwest Florida Water Management District Governing Board is a litigant

Latest cases where AUTOZONE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DUKE ENERGY FLORIDA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WERDINE FRED S