This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 04/04/2022 at 22:03:11 (UTC).

DRI-MAX RESTORATION, LLC. A/A/O AMAURY PENA vs. SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/03/2022 DRI-MAX RESTORATION, LLC A/A/O AMAURY PENA filed an Other lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN M KOHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEVIN M KOHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DRI-MAX RESTORATION, LLC. A/A/O AMAURY PENA

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA DAVID

250 N Orange Avenue Suite 605

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorney

RHOSSARD FERNANDA

4301 West Boy Scout Blvd., Ste. 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • HearingCourt Date: 07/19/2022; Court Time: 11:30 AM; Location: GENERAL CIVIL VIRTUAL; Motion: CMC - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Section: M0; Judge: KEVIN M KOHL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - GENERAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketReason: CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 07/19/2022 11:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • FinancialDate: 02/18/2022; Amount: 310.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: EPORTAL - CIVIL LAW; Receipt Number: 9041377

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DRI-MAX RESTORATION, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA DAVID