This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/05/2020 at 16:58:30 (UTC).

DOLCE, MARIAN C

Case Summary

On 03/12/2018 DOLCE, MARIAN C was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN K STARGEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN K STARGEL

 

Party Details

Decedent

DOLCE, MARIAN CLARK

Not Yet Classified

DOLEE, MICHAEL E

DOLCE, MICHAEL E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE-CLOSES FORMAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY & CONSENT TO DISCHARGE - MICHAEL DOLCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketSATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CLAIM - WATSON CLINIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - AIRLIFE MEDICAL $51.08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM- WATSON CLINIC LLP $104.72

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION-NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (CERT.COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT AND DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE / CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING- FUNERAL BILL PROOF OF PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketPAID FUNERAL BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT (E-FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING- ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION-OPENS FORMAL

    Read MoreRead Less