This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Polk County on 02/19/2022 at 21:04:02 (UTC).

DICKERSON LUTHER D. vs. TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 DICKERSON LUTHER D filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Polk County, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WAYNE DURDEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WAYNE DURDEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DICKERSON, LUTHER D.

Defendant

TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA DAVID

250 N Orange Avenue Suite 605

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY

10/12/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY

LETTER TO JUDGE FROM CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER WITH COPY OF ORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

12/17/2021: LETTER TO JUDGE FROM CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER WITH COPY OF ORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketPLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE FROM CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER WITH COPY OF ORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - GENERAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY BY SERVING SCOTT P ROWE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • FinancialDate: 10/12/2021; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: MICHAEL PAVLOU; Receipt Number: 8888873

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tower Hill SIgnature Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA DAVID