This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 09/04/2022 at 22:09:17 (UTC).

DIAZ RESTO, JUAN vs. CASTRO, KEVIN

Case Summary

On 07/06/2022 DIAZ RESTO, JUAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CASTRO, KEVIN. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARY CATHERINE GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARY CATHERINE GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAZ RESTO, JUAN

Defendants

CASTRO, KEVIN

Davenport, FL 33897

CANDELARIA OQUENDO, KAMILA

Davenport, FL 33897

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTIN ANTONIO G

1420 Celebration Blvd Ste 200

Celebration, FL 34747

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

07/06/2022: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

TRIAL MEMO / PRE-TRIAL MEMO

08/24/2022: TRIAL MEMO / PRE-TRIAL MEMO

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

08/24/2022: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • HearingCourt Date: 08/24/2022; Court Time: 11:00 AM; Location: BARTOW 5 B RED ELEVATOR; Motion: PRTC - PRE-TRIAL HEARING; Section: M2; Judge: MARY CATHERINE GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DispositionParty: KAMILA CANDELARIA OQUENDO; Disposition Code: DSAH; Description: DISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Date: 08/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DispositionParty: KEVIN CASTRO; Disposition Code: DSAH; Description: DISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Date: 08/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRIAL MEMO / PRE-TRIAL MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - KAMILA CANDELARIA OQUENDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - KEVIN CASTRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • FinancialDate: 07/07/2022; Amount: 320.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: EPORTAL - CIVIL LAW; Receipt Number: 9230664

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketReason: PRTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 08/24/2022 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT B -PICTURES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT-RESIDENTIAL LEASE FOR A SINGLE FAMILY HOME OR TOWN HOME AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin, Antonio Giovonnie