This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/06/2020 at 02:01:28 (UTC).

CUMMINGS WENDY vs. CUMMINGS JERRY

Case Summary

On 04/05/2018 CUMMINGS WENDY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CUMMINGS JERRY. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CUMMINGS, JERRY (COUNTER)

CUMMINGS, WENDY

Defendants

CUMMINGS, JERRY

CUMMINGS, WENDY (COUNTER)

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketReason: CASE_MGMT_CONF ALCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 12/11/2019 08:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO FAMILY MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketLETTER REGARDING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketLETTER FROM SELF HELP PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketReason: CASE_MGMT_CONF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 06/20/2019 09:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED JERRY CUMMINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FINANCIAL-WENDY CUMMINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketVERIFIED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less