Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 04/14/2021 at 15:40:16 (UTC).

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS, INC. vs. SAINTIL, JULIE

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SAINTIL, JULIE. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOB GRODE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00WH

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOB GRODE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS, INC.

806 Douglas Road, South Tower, Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant

SAINTIL, JULIE

Kissimmee, FL 34759

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERAZA MANUEL A

800 Douglas Rd, North Tower, Suite 450

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 05/17/2021; Court Time: 10:00 AM; Location: WINTER HAVEN VIRTUAL COURTROOM; Motion: PRTC - PRE-TRIAL HEARING; Section: W3; Judge: BOB GRODE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketVIRTUAL/VIDEO SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR JULIE SAINTIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • FinancialDate: 04/08/2021; Amount: 185.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: MANUEL PERAZA; Receipt Number: 8673888

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketReason: PRTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 05/17/2021 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC. ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PERAZA , MANUEL