This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 10/07/2020 at 20:10:53 (UTC).

COYLE CHRISTOPHER vs. COYLE DAWN

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 COYLE CHRISTOPHER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against COYLE DAWN. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CATHERINE L COMBEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CATHERINE L COMBEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COYLE, CHRISTOPHER

Defendant

COYLE, DAWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCMANN MARK D

3001 Bartow Road

Lakeland, FL 33803

Defendant Attorney

WILSON MELISSA A

620 West Polk Street

Bartow, FL 33830

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF PARENTING CLASS COMPLETION CHRISTOPHER COYLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketDEMAND FOR MANDATORY DISCOVERY DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO FAMILY LAW RULE 12285

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND INTENT TO CONTEST THE CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketDEMAND FOR MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less