This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/09/2021 at 15:48:11 (UTC).

COMMERCIAL PRODUCTS CORPORATION vs. MERLIN ENTERTAINMENT GROUP FLORIDA, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/27/2020 COMMERCIAL PRODUCTS CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MERLIN ENTERTAINMENT GROUP FLORIDA, LLC. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CATHERINE L COMBEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CATHERINE L COMBEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMERCIAL PRODUCTS CORPORATION

100 N. Tampa Street, Suite 3700

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendants

MERLIN ENTERTAINMENT GROUP FLORIDA, LLC

1452 N. Us Highway 1

Ormond Beach, FL 32174

MULTIPLIED SERVICES LLC DBA FALCON OF THE NILE WATER SOLUTIONS

C/O Fujimura De Souza, Registered Agent, 3320 Vineland Road, Suite E

Orlando, FL 32811-

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMPSON TY G

100 N Tampa St Ste 3700

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED

06/03/2020: SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

05/26/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- MULTIPLIED SERVICES LLC DBA FALCON OF THE NILE WATER SOLUTIONS LLC BY

05/20/2020: SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- MULTIPLIED SERVICES LLC DBA FALCON OF THE NILE WATER SOLUTIONS LLC BY

COMPLAINT

04/27/2020: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/27/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ MERLIN ENTERTAINMENT GROUP FLORIDA LLC

04/28/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ MERLIN ENTERTAINMENT GROUP FLORIDA LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ MULTIPLIED SERVICES LLC DBA FALCON OF THE NILE WATER SOLUTIONS LLC

04/28/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ MULTIPLIED SERVICES LLC DBA FALCON OF THE NILE WATER SOLUTIONS LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketMERLIN ENTERTAINMENT GROUP FLORIDA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DispositionParty: MULTIPLIED SERVICES LLC DBA FALCON OF THE NILE WATER SOLUTIONS; Disposition Code: DBHO; Description: DISM BEF HRG OTHER; Date: 05/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DispositionParty: MERLIN ENTERTAINMENT GROUP FLORIDA, LLC; Disposition Code: DBHO; Description: DISM BEF HRG OTHER; Date: 05/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketSERVING ANDERSON SOUZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- MULTIPLIED SERVICES LLC DBA FALCON OF THE NILE WATER SOLUTIONS LLC BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • FinancialDate: 04/28/2020; Amount: 420.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: TY THOMPSON; Receipt Number: 8338681

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ MERLIN ENTERTAINMENT GROUP FLORIDA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ MULTIPLIED SERVICES LLC DBA FALCON OF THE NILE WATER SOLUTIONS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP FLORIDA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TY G THOMPSON, ESQ