This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Polk County on 02/23/2021 at 02:22:59 (UTC).

CITIBANK NA NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY vs. TRACY DONNA K

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 CITIBANK NA NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against TRACY DONNA K. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Polk County, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEVEN L SELPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEVEN L SELPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK NA NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE OF THE NEW RESIDNETIAL MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2019-6

2807 Edgewater Drive

Orlando, FL 32804

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

Polk City, FL 33868-

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DONNA K TRACY AKA DONNA TRACY

Polk City, FL 33868-

21ST CENTURY FINANCIAL INC

11120 Frigate Bird Ave

Weeki Wachee, FL 34613-

TRACY DONNA K

Polk City, FL 33868

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

Polk City, FL 33868-

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324-

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KALMAN ALEXANDRA

2807 Edgewater Dr

Orlando, FL 32804

Defendant Attorney

SPRINGER JOHN

P O Box 3275

Tampa, FL 33601

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

10/01/2020: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

10/01/2020: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ 21ST CENTURY FINANCIAL INC

10/06/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ 21ST CENTURY FINANCIAL INC

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/DONNA K TRACY AKA DONNA TRACY

10/06/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/DONNA K TRACY AKA DONNA TRACY

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

10/06/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DONNA K TRACY AKA DONNA TRACY

10/06/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DONNA K TRACY AKA DONNA TRACY

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN TENANT #1

10/06/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN TENANT #1

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/UNKNOWN TENANT #2

10/06/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/UNKNOWN TENANT #2

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS UNSERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - 21ST CENTURY FINANCIAL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS UNSERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DONNA K TRACY AKA DONNA TRACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - DONNA K TRACY AKA DONNA TRACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketANSWER / RESPONSE - DONNA TRACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • FinancialDate: 10/06/2020; Amount: 972.50; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: JEANNIE SIFONTE; Receipt Number: 8478930

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DONNA K TRACY AKA DONNA TRACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/DONNA K TRACY AKA DONNA TRACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ 21ST CENTURY FINANCIAL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketVERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 21ST CENTURY FINANCIAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CITIBANK NA NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLEY AS TRUSTEE OF CRZ PASS-THROUGH TRUST VI is a litigant

Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPRINGER JOHN E