This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 02/15/2022 at 14:29:08 (UTC).

CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS FLORIDA LLC vs. DAY JESSICA

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS FLORIDA LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DAY JESSICA. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WAYNE DURDEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WAYNE DURDEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS FLORIDA LLC

500 N Maitland Ave, Ste 305

Maitland, FL 32751

Defendants

FLORIDA HOME TOWN BUILDERS LLC

7512 Dr Phillips Blvd, Ste 50 Through 104

Orlando, FL 32819

BUILDERS CAPITAL INVESTMENT LLC

5601 6Th Ave S, Ste 350

Seattle, WA 98108

DAY, JESSICA

Orlando, FL 32819

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KALMANSON BARRY

500 North Maitland Avenue, Suite 305

Maitland, FL 32751-0000

 

Court Documents

LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

01/29/2021: LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

COMPLAINT BY MATERIALMAN TO OWNER TO FORECLOSE CONSTRUCTION LIENS AND FOR OTHER RELIEF

01/29/2021: COMPLAINT BY MATERIALMAN TO OWNER TO FORECLOSE CONSTRUCTION LIENS AND FOR OTHER RELIEF

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

01/29/2021: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ BUILDERS CAPITAL INCESTMENT LLC

02/01/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ BUILDERS CAPITAL INCESTMENT LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ FLORIDA HOME TOWN BUILDERS LLC

02/01/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ FLORIDA HOME TOWN BUILDERS LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ JESSICA DAY

02/01/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ JESSICA DAY

SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-BUILDERS CAPITAL INVESTMENT BY SERVING KATHERINE CHRISTOFILIS

03/08/2021: SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-BUILDERS CAPITAL INVESTMENT BY SERVING KATHERINE CHRISTOFILIS

DEFENDANT BUILDERS CAPITAL INVESTMENT LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

03/24/2021: DEFENDANT BUILDERS CAPITAL INVESTMENT LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST FLORIDA HOME TOWN BUILDERS LLC

03/24/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST FLORIDA HOME TOWN BUILDERS LLC

CMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS FLORIDA LLCS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

04/16/2021: CMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS FLORIDA LLCS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEYS FEES

09/07/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEYS FEES

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

09/14/2021: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS FLORIDA LLC AND AGAINST FLORIDA HOME

09/28/2021: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS FLORIDA LLC AND AGAINST FLORIDA HOME

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketFEES PURSUANT TO FLA STAT SS713.29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANT BUILDERS CAPITAL INVESTMENT LLCS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF EVIDENTIARY HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF EVIDENTIARY HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 10/26/2021 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • FinancialDate: 10/11/2021; Amount: 27.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: BARRY KALMANSON PA; Receipt Number: 8887669

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DispositionParty: FLORIDA HOME TOWN BUILDERS LLC; Disposition Code: DFLT; Description: DISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Date: 09/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DispositionParty: JESSICA DAY; Disposition Code: DFLT; Description: DISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Date: 09/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketTOWN BUILDERS LLC AND JESSICA DAY INDIVIDUALLY ON COUNTS VII AND VIII OF THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT BUILDERS CAPITAL INVESTMENT LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-BUILDERS CAPITAL INVESTMENT BY SERVING KATHERINE CHRISTOFILIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • FinancialDate: 02/01/2021; Amount: 439.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: BARRY KALMANSON PA; Receipt Number: 8595661

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ JESSICA DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ FLORIDA HOME TOWN BUILDERS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ BUILDERS CAPITAL INCESTMENT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT BY MATERIALMAN TO OWNER TO FORECLOSE CONSTRUCTION LIENS AND FOR OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA HOME TOWN BUILDERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS FLORIDA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KALMANSON BARRY