This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 07/04/2023 at 22:05:48 (UTC).

PLANET HOME LENDING LLC vs. KENNEDY MAKESHA JUNINE

Case Summary

On 05/05/2023 PLANET HOME LENDING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against KENNEDY MAKESHA JUNINE. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D SITES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D SITES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PLANET HOME LENDING LLC

Defendants

KENNEDY, MAKESHA JUNINE

KENNEDY, NORRIS

CENTRAL RIDGE ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MAISONET LINDSAY BROOKE

LEWIS COREY

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED COMPLAINT

05/03/2023: VERIFIED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

05/03/2023: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM/CROSSCLAIM/COUNTERCLAIM/COURTERPETITION/

05/03/2023: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM/CROSSCLAIM/COUNTERCLAIM/COURTERPETITION/

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - MAKESHA JUNINE KENNEDY

05/05/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - MAKESHA JUNINE KENNEDY

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - NORRIS KENNEDY A/K/A NORRIS LA SHUN KENNEDY

05/05/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - NORRIS KENNEDY A/K/A NORRIS LA SHUN KENNEDY

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - CENTRAL RIDGE ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

05/05/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - CENTRAL RIDGE ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

05/05/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/03/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF FILING - CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

05/03/2023: NOTICE OF FILING - CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

05/03/2023: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

A NOTICE FROM THE COURT REGARDING LAWSUITS TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGES ON HOMES

05/03/2023: A NOTICE FROM THE COURT REGARDING LAWSUITS TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGES ON HOMES

ANSWER / RESPONSE - MAKESHA KENNEDY

06/02/2023: ANSWER / RESPONSE - MAKESHA KENNEDY

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2023
  • HearingCourt Date: 08/01/2023; Court Time: 9:00 AM; Location: CIVIL DIVISION 15 VIRTUAL; Motion: OTSC - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Section: 15; Judge: WILLIAM D SITES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketDEFAULT - UNKNOWN TENANT AND NORRIS KENNEDY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVIING COURTS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGGE FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT & UNSIGNED DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketREPLY TO ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketReason: OTSC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 08/01/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER / RESPONSE - MAKESHA KENNEDY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - NORRIS KENNEDY A/K/A NORRIS LA SHUN KENNEDY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - MAKESHA JUNINE KENNEDY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketA NOTICE FROM THE COURT REGARDING LAWSUITS TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGES ON HOMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketTHIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM/CROSSCLAIM/COUNTERCLAIM/COURTERPETITION/

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less