This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 08/28/2023 at 22:09:29 (UTC).

ANDINO JULIA vs. UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/29/2023 ANDINO JULIA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRANDON J RAFOOL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRANDON J RAFOOL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDINO, JULIA

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANZANILLA LEO A

Defendant Attorneys

DAVIES ANDREW R

WILKINSON J CORY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/21/2023

DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketDEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

FinancialDate: 07/05/2023; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: EPORTAL - CIVIL LAW; Receipt Number: 9687911

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketADMINISTRATION 2.516

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES IN COMPLIANCE WITH FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less