This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 06/27/2020 at 01:08:21 (UTC).

ORLANDO/ TOWN CENTER ASSOCIATES vs. FAUX MARSHA M

Case Summary

On 11/30/2007 ORLANDO/ TOWN CENTER ASSOCIATES filed an Other lawsuit against FAUX MARSHA M. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WAYNE DURDEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WAYNE DURDEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORLANDO/ TOWN CENTER ASSOCIATES

Defendants

TEDDER JOE AS TAX COLLECTOR

FAUX MARSHA AS PROPERTY APPRAISER

JIM ZINGLE, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/12/2010

DocketCASE FILE DESTROYED PER RULES OF FL JUDICIAL ADMIN 2.430

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2009

DocketSTIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2009

DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 10/06/2009 10:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2009

DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2009

DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2009

DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2009

DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2009

DocketNOTICE OF ANSWERING PLAINTIFFS EXPERT INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2009

DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2009

DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
72 More Docket Entries
12/10/2007

DocketSUZANNE CROWER 12-03-07

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2007

DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED/JOE G TEDDER TAX COLLECTOR OF POLK COUNTY FLORIDA BY SERVING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2007

DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - MARSHA M FAUX PROPERTY APPRAISER OF POLK COUNTY - 12/03/07

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2007

DocketBY SERVING LISA WHITE 12-03-07

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2007

DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED/JAMES ZINGALE DR EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF STATE OF FLORIDA DEPT OF REVENUE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2007

DocketSUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2007

DocketSUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2007

DocketSUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2007

DocketCOMPLAINT TO CHALLENGE TAX ASSESSMENTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2007

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less