This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 08/28/2023 at 22:05:44 (UTC).

YODER, RICHARD vs. UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/29/2023 YODER, RICHARD filed an Other lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT G FEGERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT G FEGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YODER, RICHARD

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CANAURA JOSE M

Defendant Attorney

GAY ALEXIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/03/2024

HearingCourt Date: 01/03/2024; Court Time: 10:00 AM; Location: GENERAL CIVIL VIRTUAL; Motion: CMC - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Section: M0; Judge: ROBERT G FEGERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketDEFENDANTS ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023

DocketORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - GENERAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketReason: CMC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketCalendar entry added for: 01/03/2024 10:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-UNIVERSAL PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023

FinancialDate: 07/03/2023; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: EPORTAL - CIVIL LAW; Receipt Number: 9687485

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK-UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less